|
09/28/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4879.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6240.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 3410.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3296.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|