|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6442.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 5910.) From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5695.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 3791.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3499.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3310.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3103.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|