09/30/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 708, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/30/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
09/08/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/30/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 33. Page 6842.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
06/10/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/03/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3785.) To Assembly. | |||
04/20/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3310.) | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/01/2010 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |