|
09/27/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4919.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6518.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6424.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Evans.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1113.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 347.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|