|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4647.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6303.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 6308.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6255.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 3277.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3164.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|