|
09/28/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5069.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6837.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6369.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6175.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 3655.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3548.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3296.)
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|