06/29/2010 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/24/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/22/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/03/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 3516.) To Assembly. | |||
05/12/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/11/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3499.) | |||
05/04/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (May 4 amended version corrected May 6.) | |||
04/30/2010 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/26/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3166.) | |||
03/17/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |