|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 0. Page 3656.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3548.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (May 13 amended version corrected May 17.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3312.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|