|
09/28/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 4903.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 28. Page 6542.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69 (d) suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 6303.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 6255.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 21.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 3745.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3499.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3301.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|