LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1456
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1456
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1456
Compare Versions
SB1456 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB1456 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB1456 Amended August 27, 2010
SB1456 Amended August 20, 2010
SB1456 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1456 Amended June 10, 2010
SB1456 Amended March 23, 2010
SB1456 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1456 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB1456 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB1456 Amended August 27, 2010
SB1456 Amended August 20, 2010
SB1456 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1456 Amended June 10, 2010
SB1456 Amended March 23, 2010
SB1456 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare