|
06/24/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Cogdill.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 9. Page 3707.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Cogdill. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3707.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3548.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3302.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3302.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Senate Rule 21.5 (k)(2) suspended. (Page 3220.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 22. (For reconsideration and vote only pending rules waiver.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3181.)
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|