07/09/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/09/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/28/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |||
06/24/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/24/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5815.) To Senate. | |||
06/21/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/17/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 16.) | |||
05/06/2010 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/15/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/15/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3197.) To Assembly. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3103.) | |||
03/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 7. | |||
02/21/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |