LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1461
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1461
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1461
Action History
05/05/2010
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3445.) Reconsideration granted.
04/20/2010
Set for hearing May 5.
04/15/2010
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
04/12/2010
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
03/11/2010
To Com. on RLS.
02/21/2010
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
02/19/2010
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.