|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 338, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 4975.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Set for hearing August 26. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4954.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4858.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6513.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6436.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 14.)
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3325.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3298.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|