08/02/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/02/2010 | Withdrawn from enrollment. Ordered returned to Assembly for further action. | |||
07/01/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/01/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5930.) To Senate. | |||
06/28/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/24/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
06/22/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 21.) | |||
05/13/2010 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/26/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/26/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3327.) To Assembly. | |||
04/20/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3301.) | |||
04/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/11/2010 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/20/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |