|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4904.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6500.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6369.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Coms. on U. & C. and JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3483.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3299.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Coms. on E., U., & C. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|