|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 294, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4944.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6245.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6104.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Ordered returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5930.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3412.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3296.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|