08/13/2010 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/05/2010 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.) | |||
07/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
06/14/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
06/03/2010 | To Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
05/03/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3412.) To Assembly. | |||
04/28/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3358.) | |||
03/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/11/2010 | To Com. on G.O. | |||
03/09/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 8. | |||
03/08/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |