08/13/2010 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/05/2010 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/23/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
05/13/2010 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/29/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3376.) To Assembly. | |||
04/27/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/26/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/16/2010 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3166.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/19/2010 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/10/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 9. | |||
03/09/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |