California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB149 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 149CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 170 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 28, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Kehoe FEBRUARY 12, 2009 An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 149, Kehoe. Claims against the state: appropriation. Existing law requires the Attorney General to pay certain judgments against the state. This bill would appropriate $110,464.40 to the Department of Justice to pay a settlement in Maternal and Child Health Access v. Managed Risk Medical Insurance Board, San Francisco Superior Court, Case No. CPF-08-508296, and $159,084 to the department to pay the judgment in McAllister v. California Coastal Commission, Monterey Superior Court, Case No. M73043. The bill would require any funds appropriated in excess of the amount required for the payment of these claims to revert to the General Fund. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The sum of one hundred ten thousand four hundred sixty-four dollars and forty cents ($110,464.40) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Department of Justice to pay a settlement in Maternal and Child Health Access v. Managed Risk Medical Insurance Board, San Francisco Superior Court, Case No. CPF-08-508296. Any funds appropriated in excess of the amount required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the General Fund. SEC. 2. The sum of one hundred fifty-nine thousand eighty-four dollars ($159,084) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Department of Justice to pay the judgment in McAllister v. California Coastal Commission, Monterey Superior Court, Case No. M73043. Any funds appropriated in excess of the amount required for the payment of this claim shall revert to the General Fund. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to pay judgment and settlement claims against the state and end claimant hardship as quickly as possible, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.