LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1491
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1491
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1491
Compare Versions
SB1491 Chaptered September 28, 2010
SB1491 Enrolled August 30, 2010
SB1491 Amended August 20, 2010
SB1491 Amended June 16, 2010
SB1491 Introduced March 11, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1491 Chaptered September 28, 2010
SB1491 Enrolled August 30, 2010
SB1491 Amended August 20, 2010
SB1491 Amended June 16, 2010
SB1491 Introduced March 11, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare