08/23/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 185, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/23/2010 | Approved by Governor. | |||
08/11/2010 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m. | |||
08/09/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4409.) To enrollment. | |||
08/04/2010 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
08/02/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
08/02/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6006.) To Senate. | |||
06/30/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 28.) | |||
06/21/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/13/2010 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/22/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3277.) To Assembly. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3186.) | |||
03/24/2010 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/16/2010 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 15. | |||
03/15/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |