|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 654, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4947.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6363.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3278.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3186.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|