|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1187.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|