02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/04/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/24/2009 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 587.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
02/23/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/13/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |||
02/12/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |