06/30/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/14/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/06/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/06/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 793.) To Assembly. | |||
04/28/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/27/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 655.) | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/14/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 420.) | |||
03/12/2009 | Set for hearing April 1. | |||
02/13/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |||
02/12/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |