|
08/27/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1011.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 480.)
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|