|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2289.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 2934.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on June 9.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 826.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 636.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|