|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2542.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 619.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 555.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 398.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|