02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
12/16/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
04/27/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
02/11/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/10/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 136.) | |||
01/29/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Set for hearing February 4. | |||
01/08/2009 | To Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
12/02/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |