|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2370.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 3078.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1093.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1025.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 729.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Coms. on HEALTH and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|