|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 345, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1922.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2539.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2478.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 543.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.)
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|