02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/15/2009 | Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/01/2009 | Set for hearing April 15. | |||
03/31/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD. Set for hearing April 1. | |||
02/15/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/14/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |