|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1766.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From Special Consent Calendar. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2236.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 376.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 339.)
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|