|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 334, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2129.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2763.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1011.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 704.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|