08/06/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
06/30/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/30/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2315.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
06/02/2009 | To Com. on U. & C. | |||
05/18/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 929.) To Assembly. | |||
05/14/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/12/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/11/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 914.) | |||
04/13/2009 | Set for hearing May 5. | |||
04/07/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
02/15/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/14/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |