06/28/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/11/2009 | To Com. on TRANS. | |||
04/23/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/23/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 620.) To Assembly. | |||
04/21/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 398.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/16/2009 | Set for hearing March 31. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
02/18/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |