07/07/2009 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/23/2009 | Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |||
06/02/2009 | To Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
05/18/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 921.) To Assembly. | |||
05/13/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/12/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/05/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/30/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 725.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/01/2009 | Set for hearing April 29. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on ED. | |||
02/18/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |