10/11/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 565, Statutes of 2009. | |||
10/11/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
09/11/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m. | |||
09/04/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
09/03/2009 | Read third time. Passed. To Senate. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |||
05/11/2009 | To Com. on INS. | |||
04/27/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/27/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 648.) To Assembly. | |||
03/25/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 347.) | |||
03/17/2009 | Set for hearing March 25. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
02/18/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |