02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/13/2009 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 876.) | |||
05/05/2009 | Set for hearing May 13. (For vote only.) | |||
04/29/2009 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 702.) | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 29. | |||
04/16/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
02/19/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |