|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2429.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3361.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 10.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3230.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3047.) Re-referred to Com. On JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Coms. on JUD. and ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1187.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 874.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 725.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|