|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 697, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4880.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69 (d) suspended. (Page 6303.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6309.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6260.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2707.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2655.)
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected December 18.)
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|