|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2421.) To enrollment. (Corrected September 16.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 3330.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 4.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on September 3.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 43. Noes 23. Page 2868.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2757.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 1002.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 607.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|