LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB191
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB191
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB191
Compare Versions
SB191 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB191 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB191 Amended July 15, 2009
SB191 Amended June 17, 2009
SB191 Amended April 20, 2009
SB191 Amended April 14, 2009
SB191 Introduced February 18, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB191 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB191 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB191 Amended July 15, 2009
SB191 Amended June 17, 2009
SB191 Amended April 20, 2009
SB191 Amended April 14, 2009
SB191 Introduced February 18, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare