08/23/2010 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |||
08/20/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6440.) To third reading. | |||
08/19/2010 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |||
08/18/2010 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Saldana. | |||
07/16/2009 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |||
07/06/2009 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |||
07/02/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
07/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.) | |||
05/11/2009 | To Com. on G.O. | |||
04/20/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/20/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 545.) To Assembly. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 477.) | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/19/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |||
02/18/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |