LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB193
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB193
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB193
Compare Versions
SB193 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB193 Amended September 11, 2009
SB193 Amended July 14, 2009
SB193 Amended May 28, 2009
SB193 Amended May 6, 2009
SB193 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB193 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB193 Amended September 11, 2009
SB193 Amended July 14, 2009
SB193 Amended May 28, 2009
SB193 Amended May 6, 2009
SB193 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare