|
02/01/2010
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 701.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 495.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|