08/06/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
07/16/2009 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1759.) To enrollment. | |||
07/13/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
07/13/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2487.) To Senate. | |||
07/08/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/07/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
07/06/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.) | |||
05/11/2009 | To Com. on G.O. | |||
04/20/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/20/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 544.) To Assembly. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 477.) | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/24/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |