|
08/04/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2705.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2665.)
|
|
|
|
12/17/2009
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|