LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB205
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB205
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB205
Compare Versions
SB205 Chaptered March 25, 2010
SB205 Enrolled March 22, 2010
SB205 Amended March 8, 2010
SB205 Amended February 4, 2010
SB205 Amended January 25, 2010
SB205 Amended January 19, 2010
SB205 Amended July 13, 2009
SB205 Amended April 14, 2009
SB205 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB205 Chaptered March 25, 2010
SB205 Enrolled March 22, 2010
SB205 Amended March 8, 2010
SB205 Amended February 4, 2010
SB205 Amended January 25, 2010
SB205 Amended January 19, 2010
SB205 Amended July 13, 2009
SB205 Amended April 14, 2009
SB205 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare